Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 06:48:01 (UTC).

GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY VS. DANIEL H GAASCH

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DANIEL H GAASCH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ganahl Lumber Company

Defendants

DANIEL H GAASCH

Hudson Insurance Company

Bentley Construction Remodeling, Inc.

Daniel H Gaasch III

Dyer 18, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Norman A. Filer

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 03/03/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 03/03/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12835400 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12662803.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12835400 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12662803.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 01/21/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 01/21/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 01/21/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 01/21/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 01/21/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 01/21/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2989743 RECEIVED ON 03/03/2021 10:27:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 03/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12835400 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12662803.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3973553 RECEIVED ON 01/21/2021 02:50:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 01/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 01/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 01/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DYER 18, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Ganahl Lumber Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant