This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/10/2018 at 09:24:58 (UTC).

FRITZ - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 FRITZ - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PUBLIC GUARDIAN

Conservatee and Conservator

JOHN E FRITZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2018
  • LETTERS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 01/05/2018; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • ORDER APPOINTING CONSERVATOR OF PERSON FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 01/05/2018; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3614373 RECEIVED ON 12/06/2017 09:11:35 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • ORDER APPOINTING CONSERVATOR OF PERSON RECEIVED ON 12/06/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • REPORT OF FIREARM PROHIBITION/RELEASE FILED AND COPY SENT TO DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/26/2017; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • AGREEMENT TO SERVE FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/26/2017; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPOINTMENT OF LPS CONSERVATOR 10/26/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE AND TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND APPLICATION FOR ADDITIONAL POWERS FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN IS GRANTED.; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN IS GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1433937 RECEIVED ON 10/24/2017 03:27:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL REPORT OF INVESTIGATOR FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/24/2017; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3596975 RECEIVED ON 10/12/2017 05:36:29 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/12/2017; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • APPOINTMENT OF LPS CONSERVATOR SCHEDULED FOR 10/19/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3595749 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 11:52:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CAPACITY DECLARATION - CONSERVATORSHIP FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • TEMPORARY LETTERS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY CONSERVATORSHIP OF PERSON FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CITATION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP AND PROOF OF SERVICE RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE AND TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND APPLICATION FOR ADDITIONAL POWERS FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.