This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 09:03:05 (UTC).

FRIENDS OF COYOTE HILLS VS. CITY OF FULLERTON

Case Summary

On 02/09/2016 FRIENDS OF COYOTE HILLS filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF FULLERTON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Appellants

CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY

FRIENDS OF COYOTE HILLS

FRIENDS OF HARBORS, BEACHES, AND PARKS

Respondents

CITY COUNCIL OF THE CITY OF FULLERTON

PACIFIC COAST HOMES

CITY OF FULLERTON

Interested Party and Respondent

PACIFIC COAST HOMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Appellant Attorney

SHUTE, MIHALY & WEINBERGER LLP

Respondent Attorney

RUTAN & TUCKER, LLP

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS ON APPEAL FILED BY CITY OF FULLERTON; PACIFIC COAST HOMES ON 04/08/2019

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS ON APPEAL FILED BY CITY OF FULLERTON; PACIFIC COAST HOMES ON 04/08/2019

REMITTITUR (G054570) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/04/2019

REMITTITUR (G054570) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/04/2019

OPINION G054570

OPINION G054570

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FRIENDS OF COYOTE HILLS FOR 224 - REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT IN THE AMOUNT OF 61.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12124248 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11948056.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FRIENDS OF COYOTE HILLS FOR 224 - REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT IN THE AMOUNT OF 61.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12124248 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11948056.

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G054570

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G054570

ORDER G054570

ORDER G054570

NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT FILED

NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT FILED

NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

NOTICE OF MAILING OF REGISTER OF ACTIONS

NOTICE OF MAILING OF REGISTER OF ACTIONS

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 51 - REPORTER TRANSCRIPT TRUST HANDLING FEE, REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 130.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12106392 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11930275.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 51 - REPORTER TRANSCRIPT TRUST HANDLING FEE, REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 130.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12106392 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11930275.

DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (APPELLANT) FILED BY FRIENDS OF COYOTE HILLS; CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY ON 02/10/2017

DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (APPELLANT) FILED BY FRIENDS OF COYOTE HILLS; CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY ON 02/10/2017

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G054570

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G054570

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 24 - TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL, DISTRICT COURT APPEAL IN THE AMOUNT OF 875.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12101819 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11925750.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 24 - TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL, DISTRICT COURT APPEAL IN THE AMOUNT OF 875.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12101819 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11925750.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY FRIENDS OF COYOTE HILLS; CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY ON 02/02/2017.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY FRIENDS OF COYOTE HILLS; CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY ON 02/02/2017.

NOTICE OF APPEAL - UNLIMITED CIVIL FILED

NOTICE OF APPEAL - UNLIMITED CIVIL FILED

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY PACIFIC COAST HOMES ON 01/11/2017

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY PACIFIC COAST HOMES ON 01/11/2017

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY CITY COUNCIL OF THE CITY OF FULLERTON; CITY OF FULLERTON ON 12/21/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY CITY COUNCIL OF THE CITY OF FULLERTON; CITY OF FULLERTON ON 12/21/2016

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS ON APPEAL FILED BY CITY OF FULLERTON; PACIFIC COAST HOMES ON 04/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1610176 RECEIVED ON 04/08/2019 03:02:01 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREMITTITUR (G054570) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPINION G054570

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketDISBURSEMENT ON TRUST 328528 TO FIRST LEGAL NETWORK ISSUED IN THE AMOUNT OF 18.50 DUE TO OTHER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FRIENDS OF COYOTE HILLS FOR 224 - REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT IN THE AMOUNT OF 61.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12124248 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11948056.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G054570

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER G054570

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketREFUND REQUEST PROCESSED FOR FRIENDS OF COYOTE HILLS FOR PAYMENT OF $18.50 TAKEN ON 3/7/17.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2016
  • DocketTHE COURT DEEMS THIS CASE EXCEPTIONAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/08/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY; FRIENDS OF COYOTE HILLS; FRIENDS OF HARBORS, BEACHES, AND PARKS ON 02/09/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2442517 RECEIVED ON 02/09/2016 04:57:02 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CLASTER, WILLIAM ON 02/09/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11918627 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11742824.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - OTHER FILED BY FRIENDS OF COYOTE HILLS; CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY; FRIENDS OF HARBORS, BEACHES, AND PARKS ON 02/09/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FRIENDS OF COYOTE HILLS; CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY; FRIENDS OF HARBORS, BEACHES, AND PARKS ON 02/09/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE FILED BY FRIENDS OF COYOTE HILLS; CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY; FRIENDS OF HARBORS, BEACHES, AND PARKS ON 02/09/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2442377 RECEIVED ON 02/09/2016 02:00:45 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less