This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/04/2021 at 10:57:52 (UTC).

FREDERICK C. BALZER VS. TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA INC.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 FREDERICK C BALZER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frederick C. Balzer

Defendants

DWW III Co., Inc.

Toyota Motor Sales, USA Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'CONNOR LAW GROUP, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

Beatty & Myers LLP

Other Attorneys

HALLSTROM, KLEIN & WARD, LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12978159 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12806078.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12978159 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12806078.

MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION (ORAL OR WRITTEN) FILED BY BALZER, FREDERICK C. ON 12/01/2021

MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION (ORAL OR WRITTEN) FILED BY BALZER, FREDERICK C. ON 12/01/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY BALZER, FREDERICK C. ON 12/01/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY BALZER, FREDERICK C. ON 12/01/2021

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY BALZER, FREDERICK C. ON 12/01/2021

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY BALZER, FREDERICK C. ON 12/01/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12839227 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12666737.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12839227 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12666737.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DWW III CO., INC.; TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA INC. ON 01/27/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DWW III CO., INC.; TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA INC. ON 01/27/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/13/2021 10:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/13/2021 10:30:00 AM.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DWW III CO., INC. ON 11/18/2020

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DWW III CO., INC. ON 11/18/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12795563 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12622580.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12795563 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12622580.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DWW III CO., INC. ON 10/14/2020

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DWW III CO., INC. ON 10/14/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12774143 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12600782.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12774143 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12600782.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA INC. ON 08/26/2020

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA INC. ON 08/26/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BALZER, FREDERICK C. ON 07/09/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BALZER, FREDERICK C. ON 07/09/2020

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 06/01/2020.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 06/01/2020.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12749442 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12575842.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12749442 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12575842.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: LEE; Department: W15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: LEE; Department: W15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION (ORAL OR WRITTEN); Judge: LEE; Department: W15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION (ORAL OR WRITTEN) SCHEDULED FOR 03/17/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12978159 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12806078.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21095066 RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021 04:34:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION (ORAL OR WRITTEN) FILED BY BALZER, FREDERICK C. ON 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY BALZER, FREDERICK C. ON 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1924100 RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021 04:34:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY BALZER, FREDERICK C. ON 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12774143 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12600782.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1762940 RECEIVED ON 08/26/2020 08:59:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA INC. ON 08/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41096905 RECEIVED ON 07/09/2020 05:53:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BALZER, FREDERICK C. ON 07/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12749442 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12575842.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3911175 RECEIVED ON 06/01/2020 04:14:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 06/01/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BALZER, FREDERICK C. ON 06/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY BALZER, FREDERICK C. ON 06/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D W W III CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc is a litigant