This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 09:57:01 (UTC).

FRED F. JAFARI VS. THE VERTEX COMPANIES, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 FRED F JAFARI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THE VERTEX COMPANIES, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRED F. JAFARI

SIGMAX MEDIA

Defendant

THE VERTEX COMPANIES, INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 08/20/2021 08:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY JAFARI, FRED F. ON 08/18/2021; Filing Party: JAFARI, FRED F. ON 08/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY JAFARI, FRED F. ON 07/02/2021; Filing Party: JAFARI, FRED F. ON 07/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY JAFARI, FRED F FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12903109 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12730910.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/20/2021 AT 08:00:00 AM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY JAFARI, FRED F.; SIGMAX MEDIA ON 06/22/2021; Filing Party: JAFARI, FRED F.; SIGMAX MEDIA ON 06/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE VERTEX COMPANIES INC is a litigant