This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 11:46:03 (UTC).

FRANK VERRENGIA VS. DOE 1

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 FRANK VERRENGIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOE 1. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frank Verrengia

Defendants

Doe 1

The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saunders & Walker, PA

Defendant Attorney

Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF TRANSFER) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/15/2021

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF TRANSFER) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/15/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-09-13 11:01:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-09-13 11:01:00.0.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY VERRENGIA, FRANK ON 09/08/2021.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY VERRENGIA, FRANK ON 09/08/2021.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31055006 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31055006 REJECTED.

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE ON 07/23/2021

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE ON 07/23/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/21/2021 03:07:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/21/2021 03:07:00 PM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VERRENGIA, FRANK ON 07/14/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VERRENGIA, FRANK ON 07/14/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY VERRENGIA, FRANK ON 06/28/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY VERRENGIA, FRANK ON 06/28/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VERRENGIA, FRANK ON 06/09/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VERRENGIA, FRANK ON 06/09/2021

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF TRANSFER) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILE CONTENTS TRANSFERRED TO RECEIVING COURT LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (RECEIPT FOR RECORDS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketTHE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THE ABOVE-ENTITLED MATTER TRANSFERRED TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AS PART OF THE COORDINATION ACTIONS, CASE NUMBER JCCP 5101, PURSUANT TO THE NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING ADD-ON, VERRENGIA V. THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE, ET AL., (OSCS CASE NO. 30-2021-01195215) TO JCCP 5101, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ON 09/08/2021. NO FEES ARE REQUIRED FOR THIS TRANSFER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-09-13 11:01:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31059518 RECEIVED ON 09/08/2021 08:49:43 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY VERRENGIA, FRANK ON 09/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31055006 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21045063 RECEIVED ON 07/23/2021 10:50:09 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12919949 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12747808.

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY VERRENGIA, FRANK ON 05/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31013967 RECEIVED ON 05/11/2021 07:36:28 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER () CAMERA FINDING OF REASONABLE AND MERITORIOUS CAUSE FOR FILING OF ACTION AND 2) ORDER TO SEAL AND KEEP CONFIDENTIAL ALL CERTIFICATED OF MERIT) FILED BY VERRENGIA, FRANK ON 05/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21016905 RECEIVED ON 05/11/2021 07:45:55 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (1) CAMERA FINDING OF REASONABLE AND MERITORIOUS CAUSE FOR FILING OF ACTION AND 2) ORDER TO SEAL AND KEEP CONFIDENTIAL ALL CERTIFICATED OF MERIT) FILED BY VERRENGIA, FRANK ON 05/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31002731 RECEIVED ON 04/12/2021 04:37:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12872388 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12700067.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY VERRENGIA, FRANK ON 04/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VERRENGIA, FRANK ON 04/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 04/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOOP OF ORANGE is a litigant