Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/17/2017 at 07:51:16 (UTC).

FRANK N. RICCHIAZZI VS. RICHARD MATTHEWS

Case Summary

On 09/29/2015 FRANK N RICCHIAZZI filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against RICHARD MATTHEWS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRANK N. RICCHIAZZI

SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC

Defendant and Other

RICHARD MATTHEWS

Cross Defendants

CHARLES W. PARRET

KING PARRET & DROSTE LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WEINTRAUB TOBIN CHEDIAK COLEMAN GRODIN

WEINTRAUB TOBIN

Defendant and Other Attorney

TOWLE DENISON & MANISCALCO LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RICCHIAZZI, FRANK N.; SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/13/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RICCHIAZZI, FRANK N.; SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/13/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY RICCHIAZZI, FRANK N.; SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 04/19/2016

NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY RICCHIAZZI, FRANK N.; SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 04/19/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/18/2016 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/18/2016 02:00:00 PM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4461779 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4461779 REJECTED.

AMENDED ANSWER FILED BY MATTHEWS, RICHARD ON 03/21/2016

AMENDED ANSWER FILED BY MATTHEWS, RICHARD ON 03/21/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/29/2016 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/29/2016 10:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11926605 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11750816.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11926605 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11750816.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MATTHEWS, RICHARD ON 02/22/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MATTHEWS, RICHARD ON 02/22/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/24/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/24/2016

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY RICCHIAZZI, FRANK N.; SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 02/17/2016

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY RICCHIAZZI, FRANK N.; SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 02/17/2016

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY RICCHIAZZI, FRANK N. ON 01/26/2016

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY RICCHIAZZI, FRANK N. ON 01/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY MATTHEWS, RICHARD ON 12/16/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY MATTHEWS, RICHARD ON 12/16/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11876341 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11700520.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11876341 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11700520.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MATTHEWS, RICHARD ON 11/02/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MATTHEWS, RICHARD ON 11/02/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11867292 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11691476.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11867292 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11691476.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RICCHIAZZI, FRANK N.; SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 09/29/2015

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RICCHIAZZI, FRANK N.; SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 09/29/2015

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RICCHIAZZI, FRANK N.; SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 09/29/2015

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RICCHIAZZI, FRANK N.; SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 09/29/2015

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RICCHIAZZI, FRANK N.; SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1363612 RECEIVED ON 01/13/2017 02:37:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/21/2016 03:07:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/28/2017 AT 08:45 AM IN DEPARTMENT C10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 03/28/2017 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY RICCHIAZZI, FRANK N.; SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 11/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3481379 RECEIVED ON 11/18/2016 02:22:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MATTHEWS, RICHARD ON 10/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2417378 RECEIVED ON 10/23/2015 12:01:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC; RICCHIAZZI, FRANK N. ON 10/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3337880 RECEIVED ON 10/05/2015 11:26:37 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 09/29/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11854828 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11679070.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RICCHIAZZI, FRANK N.; SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 09/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RICCHIAZZI, FRANK N.; SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 09/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY RICCHIAZZI, FRANK N.; SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 09/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4442498 RECEIVED ON 09/29/2015 11:28:38 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN CLEMENTE RRM LLC is a litigant