This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/13/2020 at 06:55:11 (UTC).

FRANCISCO GUERRA VS. TRANSACTION CORPORATION INC.

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 FRANCISCO GUERRA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TRANSACTION CORPORATION INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Francisco Guerra

Defendants

TRANSACTION CORPORATION INC.

MICHAEL BROOKS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Houston M. Watson II

Other Attorneys

HOUSTON M. WATSON

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY GUERRA, FRANCISCO ON 03/17/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY GUERRA, FRANCISCO ON 03/17/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE - CERTIFIED MAIL - OUT OF STATE FILED BY GUERRA, FRANCISCO ON 03/17/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE - CERTIFIED MAIL - OUT OF STATE FILED BY GUERRA, FRANCISCO ON 03/17/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GUERRA, FRANCISCO ON 02/13/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GUERRA, FRANCISCO ON 02/13/2020

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41065239 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41065239 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2889724 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2889724 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41063387 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41063387 REJECTED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/22/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/22/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2887540 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2887540 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2887071 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2887071 REJECTED.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MOSS, ROBERT ON 01/30/2020.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MOSS, ROBERT ON 01/30/2020.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12702680 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12527779.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12702680 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12527779.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GUERRA, FRANCISCO ON 01/30/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GUERRA, FRANCISCO ON 01/30/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY GUERRA, FRANCISCO ON 01/30/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY GUERRA, FRANCISCO ON 01/30/2020

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MOSS; Department: C14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY GUERRA, FRANCISCO ON 03/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1731898 RECEIVED ON 03/17/2020 05:31:56 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - CERTIFIED MAIL - OUT OF STATE FILED BY GUERRA, FRANCISCO ON 03/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2903400 RECEIVED ON 03/17/2020 05:15:31 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3888471 RECEIVED ON 02/13/2020 05:02:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GUERRA, FRANCISCO ON 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41065239 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2889724 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41063387 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/22/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2887540 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2887071 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12702680 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12527779.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1714844 RECEIVED ON 01/30/2020 04:28:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MOSS, ROBERT ON 01/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GUERRA, FRANCISCO ON 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY GUERRA, FRANCISCO ON 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATSON II HOUSTON M.