This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:13:26 (UTC).

FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS VS. JEONG AHN

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JEONG AHN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS

Defendant

JEONG AHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALDER AND MELLO, APC

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 09/09/2013

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 09/09/2013

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11437631 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11261543.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11437631 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11261543.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/22/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/22/2013

WRIT (ISSUED ON 8/22/13) RECEIVED ON 08/22/2013.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 8/22/13) RECEIVED ON 08/22/2013.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/22/2013

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/22/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/12/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/22/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/22/2013

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/22/2013

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/22/2013

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 09/09/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11437631 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11261543.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 8/22/13) RECEIVED ON 08/22/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/22/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/22/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/22/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/22/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 467311 RECEIVED ON 08/22/2013 10:28:11 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY FRANCISCAN GARDEN APARTMENTS ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 348158 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 11:16:16 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less