This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:31:09 (UTC).

FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. VS. ANTONIO BARRIOS

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANTONIO BARRIOS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC.

Defendant

ANTONIO BARRIOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANLOCHEM & ASSOCIATES LLP

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (CLAIM AND DELIVERY) FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 10/19/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (CLAIM AND DELIVERY) FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 10/19/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 10/10/2017

WRIT (ISSUED ON 02/20/2018) RECEIVED ON 02/16/2018.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 02/20/2018) RECEIVED ON 02/16/2018.

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 01/25/2018

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 01/25/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12239977 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12063657.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12239977 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12063657.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12301956 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12125716.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12301956 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12125716.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 01/05/2018

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 01/05/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 10/10/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2628491 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2628491 REJECTED.

JUDGMENT FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 01/29/2018

JUDGMENT FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 01/29/2018

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 01/25/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 01/25/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 10/10/2017

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 10/19/2017

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 10/19/2017

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 02/09/2018) RECEIVED ON 02/07/2018.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 02/09/2018) RECEIVED ON 02/07/2018.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12297486 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12121226.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12297486 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12121226.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4814368 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4814368 REJECTED.

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4814368 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12301956 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12125716.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 02/20/2018) RECEIVED ON 02/16/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2641811 RECEIVED ON 02/16/2018 03:55:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 02/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12297486 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12121226.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 02/09/2018) RECEIVED ON 02/07/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3634321 RECEIVED ON 02/07/2018 03:02:52 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED ON 01/05/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12239977 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12063657.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 10/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (CLAIM AND DELIVERY) FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 10/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 10/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4779419 RECEIVED ON 10/19/2017 03:10:44 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234192 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057871.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY FOURSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4776169 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 03:49:42 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.