This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:33:21 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC VS. MODA TRANSPORTATION LLC

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MODA TRANSPORTATION LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

Defendant

MODA TRANSPORTATION LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACDOWELL & ASSOCIATES LTD

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 02/06/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 02/06/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 02/06/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 02/06/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 02/06/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 02/06/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12496516 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12320220.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12496516 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12320220.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 02/06/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 02/06/2019.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/20/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/20/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 04/24/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 04/24/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 05/15/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 05/15/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 05/15/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1623495 RECEIVED ON 05/15/2019 02:56:21 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 04/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1616222 RECEIVED ON 04/24/2019 03:57:23 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/20/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 02/06/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12496516 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12320220.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 02/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 02/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 02/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2759970 RECEIVED ON 02/06/2019 11:54:32 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less