This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:19:05 (UTC).

FORBES VS. SCHULTZ

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 FORBES filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SCHULTZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAMIL FORBES

Defendants

SADDLEBACK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

JOSH RANDALL, MD

RANDALL S. CHONG, MD

MATTHEW R. SCHULTZ, MD

RANDALL S. CHONG

MATTHEW R. SCHULTZ

JOSH RANDALL

SADDLEBACK MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOEL W. BARUCH, PC

Defendant Attorneys

BAKER, KEENER & NAHRA, LLP

CARROLL, KELLY, TROTTER, FRANZEN, MCKENNA & PEABODY

LA FOLLETTE, JOHNSON, DE HAAS, FESLER & AMES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY SCHULTZ, MATTHEW R.; CHONG, RANDALL S. ON 10/15/2013

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY SCHULTZ, MATTHEW R.; CHONG, RANDALL S. ON 10/15/2013

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MONROE, WILLIAM ON 08/12/2013.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MONROE, WILLIAM ON 08/12/2013.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SCHULTZ, MATTHEW R.; CHONG, RANDALL S. ON 11/21/2013

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SCHULTZ, MATTHEW R.; CHONG, RANDALL S. ON 11/21/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11461287 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11285179.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11461287 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11285179.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FORBES, KAMIL ON 11/05/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FORBES, KAMIL ON 11/05/2013

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SCHULTZ, MATTHEW R.; CHONG, RANDALL S. ON 09/20/2013

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SCHULTZ, MATTHEW R.; CHONG, RANDALL S. ON 09/20/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/07/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/07/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FORBES, KAMIL ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FORBES, KAMIL ON 08/12/2013

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY RANDALL, MD, JOSH ON 09/25/2013

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY RANDALL, MD, JOSH ON 09/25/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SCHULTZ, MATTHEW R.; CHONG, RANDALL S. ON 10/29/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SCHULTZ, MATTHEW R.; CHONG, RANDALL S. ON 10/29/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11468944 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11292836.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11468944 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11292836.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SADDLEBACK MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 10/25/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SADDLEBACK MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 10/25/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430837 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254709.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430837 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254709.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RANDALL, JOSH ON 10/24/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RANDALL, JOSH ON 10/24/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FORBES, KAMIL ON 09/04/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FORBES, KAMIL ON 09/04/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FORBES, KAMIL ON 09/04/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FORBES, KAMIL ON 09/04/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FORBES, KAMIL ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FORBES, KAMIL ON 08/12/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FORBES, KAMIL ON 09/04/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FORBES, KAMIL ON 09/04/2013

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SCHULTZ, MATTHEW R.; CHONG, RANDALL S. ON 11/21/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4111039 RECEIVED ON 11/21/2013 02:07:21 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FORBES, KAMIL ON 11/05/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4102388 RECEIVED ON 11/05/2013 10:38:52 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SCHULTZ, MATTHEW R.; CHONG, RANDALL S. ON 10/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1121576 RECEIVED ON 10/29/2013 03:23:41 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SADDLEBACK MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 10/25/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 375095 RECEIVED ON 10/25/2013 08:31:09 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FORBES, KAMIL ON 09/04/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FORBES, KAMIL ON 09/04/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FORBES, KAMIL ON 09/04/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 472850 RECEIVED ON 09/04/2013 04:24:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MONROE, WILLIAM ON 08/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430837 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254709.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FORBES, KAMIL ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FORBES, KAMIL ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY FORBES, KAMIL ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462237 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 09:48:54 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less