This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 06:47:11 (UTC).

FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY VS. WERTZ

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against WERTZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

San Joaquin Hills Transportation Corridor Agency

Foothill/Eastern Transportation Corridor Agency

Respondent

Alicia Maria Wertz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 07/22/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 07/22/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 07/22/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 07/22/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 06/14/2021 02:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 06/14/2021 02:30:00 PM.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 06/11/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 06/11/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/24/2021 04:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/24/2021 04:30:00 PM.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/12/2021.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/12/2021.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 05/12/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 05/12/2021

PETITION - TOLL EVASION FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 05/12/2021

PETITION - TOLL EVASION FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 05/12/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41220014 RECEIVED ON 07/22/2021 03:08:09 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 07/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION - TOLL EVASION DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 07/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31041989 RECEIVED ON 07/22/2021 03:08:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 06/14/2021 02:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL CONTINUED TO 07/26/2021 AT 02:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/26/2021 AT 02:30:00 PM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 06/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31026169 RECEIVED ON 06/11/2021 10:53:49 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/24/2021 04:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 06/14/2021 AT 02:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT C66.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/14/2021 AT 02:30:00 PM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41192489 RECEIVED ON 05/12/2021 09:37:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 05/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - TOLL EVASION FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 05/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Joaquin Hills Transportation Corridor Agency is a litigant

Latest cases where FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AND SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY is a litigant