This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 07:03:27 (UTC).

FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY VS. PHILLIPS

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against PHILLIPS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

San Joaquin Hills Transportation Corridor Agency

Foothill/Eastern Transportation Corridor Agency

Respondent and Defendant

Tanya Phillips

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/19/2021 01:07:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/19/2021 01:07:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 04/02/2021 01:23:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 04/02/2021 01:23:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/02/2021 01:09:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/02/2021 01:09:00 PM.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/24/2021.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/24/2021.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 03/24/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 03/24/2021

PETITION - TOLL EVASION FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 03/24/2021

PETITION - TOLL EVASION FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 03/24/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • HearingDescription: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; Department: C66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/19/2021 01:07:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL CONTINUED TO 06/14/2021 AT 02:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/14/2021 AT 02:30:00 PM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 04/02/2021 01:23:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER DATED 04/02/2021 CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/02/2021 01:09:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/17/2102 AT 02:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT C66.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/17/2102 AT 02:30:00 PM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1826623 RECEIVED ON 03/24/2021 11:02:31 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/24/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 03/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - TOLL EVASION FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 03/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Joaquin Hills Transportation Corridor Agency is a litigant

Latest cases where FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AND SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY is a litigant