This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/28/2021 at 07:38:04 (UTC).

FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY VS. MARTIN

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against MARTIN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Foothill/Eastern Transportation Corridor Agency

Respondent

Teriann Martin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

JUDGMENT (FOR TOLL EVASION PENALTIES) FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 08/11/2021

JUDGMENT (FOR TOLL EVASION PENALTIES) FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 08/11/2021

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/04/2021.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/04/2021.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 08/04/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 08/04/2021

PETITION - TOLL EVASION FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 08/04/2021

PETITION - TOLL EVASION FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 08/04/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketPETITION - TOLL EVASION DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketTHE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO PETITION - TOLL EVASION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT (FOR TOLL EVASION PENALTIES) FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 08/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41224703 RECEIVED ON 08/04/2021 01:53:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 08/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - TOLL EVASION FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 08/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AND SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY is a litigant