This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 06:45:34 (UTC).

FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY VS. AWWAD

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against AWWAD. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

San Joaquin Hills Transportation Corridor Agency

Foothill/Eastern Transportation Corridor Agency

Respondent

Mahmoud Awwad

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP

 

Court Documents

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 07/08/2021

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 07/08/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 07/02/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 07/02/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

JUDGMENT (FOR TOLL EVASION PENALTIES) FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 05/10/2021

JUDGMENT (FOR TOLL EVASION PENALTIES) FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 05/10/2021

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/30/2021.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/30/2021.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 04/30/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 04/30/2021

PETITION - TOLL EVASION FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 04/30/2021

PETITION - TOLL EVASION FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 04/30/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 07/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41212677 RECEIVED ON 07/02/2021 03:09:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 07/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21037530 RECEIVED ON 07/02/2021 03:09:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketPETITION - TOLL EVASION DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketTHE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO PETITION - TOLL EVASION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT (FOR TOLL EVASION PENALTIES) FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 05/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1842135 RECEIVED ON 04/30/2021 03:45:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/30/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 04/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - TOLL EVASION FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 04/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Joaquin Hills Transportation Corridor Agency is a litigant

Latest cases where FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AND SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY is a litigant