Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/19/2021 at 09:02:51 (UTC).

FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRDIOR AGENCY, SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION AGENCY VS. STARK

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRDIOR AGENCY, SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION AGENCY filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against STARK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

San Joaquin Hills Transportation Corridor Agency

Foothill/Eastern Transportation Corridor Agency

Defendant and Respondent

Bryan Stark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

JUDGMENT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/05/2021

JUDGMENT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/05/2021

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 02/02/2021.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 02/02/2021.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 02/02/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 02/02/2021

PETITION - TOLL EVASION FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 02/02/2021

PETITION - TOLL EVASION FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 02/02/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketPETITION - TOLL EVASION DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketTHE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO PETITION - TOLL EVASION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2980217 RECEIVED ON 02/02/2021 08:06:40 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 02/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 02/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - TOLL EVASION FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY; SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 02/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Joaquin Hills Transportation Corridor Agency is a litigant