This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/10/2018 at 09:25:36 (UTC).

FLOWERS - PROBATE

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 FLOWERS - PROBATE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Executor

IVAN JOYNER

Decedent

RUTH FLOWERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Executor Attorney

THE MCCABE LAW FIRM, APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2018
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY THE MCCABE LAW FIRM, APC FOR 141- CERTIFYING A COPY, 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12308919 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12132659.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • LETTERS FILED BY JOYNER, IVAN ON 03/02/2018; Filing Party: JOYNER, IVAN ON 03/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JOYNER, IVAN ON 02/13/2018; Filing Party: JOYNER, IVAN ON 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENT TO DUTIES FILED BY JOYNER, IVAN ON 02/13/2018; Filing Party: JOYNER, IVAN ON 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4814788 RECEIVED ON 02/12/2018 04:41:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • LETTERS RECEIVED ON 1/29/18 AND REJECTED ON 2/2/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2635157 RECEIVED ON 01/29/2018 03:06:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • ORDER FOR PROBATE FILED BY JOYNER, IVAN ON 02/01/2018; Filing Party: JOYNER, IVAN ON 02/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • LETTERS RECEIVED 1/29/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2017
  • (P) PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL - LETTERS TESTAMENTARY SCHEDULED FOR 12/28/2017 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C08 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL - LETTERS TESTAMENTARY 11/16/2017 02:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • (P) PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL - LETTERS TESTAMENTARY CONTINUED TO 12/28/2017 AT 02:00 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • RETURNED CHECK NOTICE MAILED BY FISCAL SERVICES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • PAYMENT FOR 196 - FIRST PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION OR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, OR THE FIRST PETITION FOR SPECIAL LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH THE POWERS OF A GENERAL PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233738 IN THE AMOUNT OF 465.00 VOIDED DUE TO NSF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • RETURNED CHECK NOTICE OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • WILL FILED BY JOYNER, IVAN ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: JOYNER, IVAN ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FLOWERS, RUTH FOR 196 - FIRST PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION OR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, OR THE FIRST PETITION FOR SPECIAL LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH THE POWERS OF A GENERAL PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO IN THE AMOUNT OF 465.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233738 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057418.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • (P) PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL - LETTERS TESTAMENTARY SCHEDULED FOR 11/16/2017 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C08 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED BY JOYNER, IVAN ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: JOYNER, IVAN ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.