This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 08:49:50 (UTC).

FLORENCE MIRA YOON VS. JESUS ALVARADO

Case Summary

On 10/22/2018 FLORENCE MIRA YOON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JESUS ALVARADO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

FLORENCE MIRA YOON

ARIS YOON

ALEXANDER YOON

JAMES YOON

Defendants

JESUS ALVARADO

FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCIES

SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRID

SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRI

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATIO

Plaintiffs and Minors

ARIS YOON

ALEXANDER YOON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

AITKEN AITKEN COHN

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4987229 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4987229 REJECTED.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR EXTENSION OF TIME) FILED BY YOON, FLORENCE MIRA ON 05/20/2019

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR EXTENSION OF TIME) FILED BY YOON, FLORENCE MIRA ON 05/20/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/28/2019 10:13:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/28/2019 10:13:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12550194 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12374073.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12550194 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12374073.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDERS RECEIVED ON 05/10/2019.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDERS RECEIVED ON 05/10/2019.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER THEREON) FILED BY YOON, FLORENCE MIRA ON 01/11/2019

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER THEREON) FILED BY YOON, FLORENCE MIRA ON 01/11/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CASE REASSIGNED TO CHARLES MARGINES EFFECTIVE 01/28/2019.

CASE REASSIGNED TO CHARLES MARGINES EFFECTIVE 01/28/2019.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12473065 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12296764.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12473065 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12296764.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDERS RECEIVED ON 12/21/2018.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDERS RECEIVED ON 12/21/2018.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/28/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C64 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/28/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C64 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY YOON, ALEXANDER ON 10/29/2018

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY YOON, ALEXANDER ON 10/29/2018

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY YOON, FLORENCE MIRA ON 10/24/2018

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY YOON, FLORENCE MIRA ON 10/24/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY YOON, FLORENCE MIRA; YOON, JAMES; YOON, ALEXANDER; YOON, ARIS ON 10/24/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY YOON, FLORENCE MIRA; YOON, JAMES; YOON, ALEXANDER; YOON, ARIS ON 10/24/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY YOON, FLORENCE MIRA; YOON, JAMES ON 10/22/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY YOON, FLORENCE MIRA; YOON, JAMES ON 10/22/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY YOON, FLORENCE MIRA; YOON, JAMES; YOON, ALEXANDER; YOON, ARIS ON 10/22/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY YOON, FLORENCE MIRA; YOON, JAMES; YOON, ALEXANDER; YOON, ARIS ON 10/22/2018

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/11/2019 03:26:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/21/2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 11/21/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY YOON, FLORENCE MIRA; YOON, JAMES; YOON, ALEXANDER; YOON, ARIS ON 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4988492 RECEIVED ON 07/09/2019 02:38:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4987229 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR EXTENSION OF TIME) FILED BY YOON, FLORENCE MIRA ON 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/28/2019 10:13:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3724224 RECEIVED ON 10/29/2018 09:14:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • YOON, FLORENCE MIRA APPOINTED AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM CR .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY YOON, FLORENCE MIRA ON 10/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY YOON, FLORENCE MIRA; YOON, JAMES; YOON, ALEXANDER; YOON, ARIS ON 10/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4900890 RECEIVED ON 10/24/2018 02:38:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HORN, FREDERICK ON 10/22/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12440977 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12264675.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY YOON, FLORENCE MIRA; YOON, JAMES ON 10/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY YOON, FLORENCE MIRA; YOON, JAMES; YOON, ALEXANDER; YOON, ARIS ON 10/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3722122 RECEIVED ON 10/22/2018 03:38:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRI is a litigant

Latest cases where FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRID is a litigant

Latest cases where San Joaquin Hills Transportation Corridor Agency is a litigant

Latest cases where FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AND SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY is a litigant