This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:29:27 (UTC).

FIX AUTO TUSTIN VS. JOSE JIMENEZ

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 FIX AUTO TUSTIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOSE JIMENEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIX AUTO TUSTIN

Defendant

JOSE JIMENEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 08/24/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY FIX AUTO TUSTIN ON 07/07/2017; Filing Party: FIX AUTO TUSTIN ON 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 08/24/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDS LEGAL SUPPORT SYSTEMS, INC. FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12181757 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12005467.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO PRODUCE STATEMENT OF ASSETS AND TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION FILED BY FIX AUTO TUSTIN ON 07/03/2017; Filing Party: FIX AUTO TUSTIN ON 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY FIX AUTO TUSTIN ON 05/26/2016; Filing Party: FIX AUTO TUSTIN ON 05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 05/26/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY MARY, JOY VALLE FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927146 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751371.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/26/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY FIX AUTO TUSTIN ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: FIX AUTO TUSTIN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less