This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 06:05:09 (UTC).

FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE VS. WATTS REGULATOR CO.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against WATTS REGULATOR CO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendants

WATTS REGULATOR CO.

BARBOUR CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURTAUGH MEYER NELSON & TREGLIA LLP

Defendant Attorney

MCGARRY & LAUFENBERG

 

Court Documents

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT (JOINT) FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 08/22/2016

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT (JOINT) FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 08/22/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/18/2016 01:56:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/18/2016 01:56:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2016-08-24 09:00:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2016-08-24 09:00:00.0.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 12/14/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 12/14/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 01/06/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 01/06/2017

CASE REASSIGNED TO GLENDA SANDERS EFFECTIVE 01/09/2017.

CASE REASSIGNED TO GLENDA SANDERS EFFECTIVE 01/09/2017.

COMPLAINT FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 02/26/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WATTS REGULATOR CO. ON 07/13/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WATTS REGULATOR CO. ON 07/13/2016

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 09/20/2016

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 09/20/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 03/28/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 03/28/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/02/2016 01:59:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/02/2016 01:59:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2017-01-20 13:30:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2017-01-20 13:30:00.0.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WATTS REGULATOR CO. ON 04/28/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WATTS REGULATOR CO. ON 04/28/2016

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY WATTS REGULATOR CO. ON 09/21/2016

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY WATTS REGULATOR CO. ON 09/21/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 04/21/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 04/21/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 02/26/2016

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 04/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4712545 RECEIVED ON 04/21/2017 11:17:28 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2017-01-20 13:30:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 06/06/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX101 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT STATEMENT FILED BY WATTS REGULATOR CO. ON 01/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2524359 RECEIVED ON 01/19/2017 02:36:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE REASSIGNED TO CX101 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER ON 01/20/2017 AT 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3400576 RECEIVED ON 04/07/2016 11:12:47 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 03/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4523878 RECEIVED ON 03/28/2016 07:07:07 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/23/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927857 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752082.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446739 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 02:18:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.