This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:46:18 (UTC).

FILOMENO AMARILLAS SILVAS VS. DO SUN LEE

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 FILOMENO AMARILLAS SILVAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DO SUN LEE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FILOMENO AMARILLAS SILVAS

Defendant

DO SUN LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSELL & LAZARUS APC

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928210 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752435.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928210 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752435.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 02/26/2016.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SILVAS, FILOMENO AMARILLAS ON 06/16/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SILVAS, FILOMENO AMARILLAS ON 06/16/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2016 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2016 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SILVAS, FILOMENO AMARILLAS ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SILVAS, FILOMENO AMARILLAS ON 02/26/2016

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY SILVAS, FILOMENO AMARILLAS ON 06/13/2016

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY SILVAS, FILOMENO AMARILLAS ON 06/13/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SILVAS, FILOMENO AMARILLAS ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SILVAS, FILOMENO AMARILLAS ON 02/26/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B SCHEDULED FOR 05/17/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B SCHEDULED FOR 05/17/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

COMPLAINT FILED BY SILVAS, FILOMENO AMARILLAS ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY SILVAS, FILOMENO AMARILLAS ON 02/26/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B 05/17/2016 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B 05/17/2016 08:45:00 AM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SILVAS, FILOMENO AMARILLAS ON 06/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4562924 RECEIVED ON 06/16/2016 11:29:49 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY SILVAS, FILOMENO AMARILLAS ON 06/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4561300 RECEIVED ON 06/13/2016 04:08:10 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B 05/17/2016 08:45:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 06/28/2016 AT 08:45 AM IN DEPARTMENT C10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 06/28/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B SCHEDULED FOR 05/17/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2016 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928210 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752435.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SILVAS, FILOMENO AMARILLAS ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SILVAS, FILOMENO AMARILLAS ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SILVAS, FILOMENO AMARILLAS ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385382 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 03:40:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.