This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/11/2017 at 07:16:58 (UTC).

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION VS. SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC

Case Summary

On 09/21/2011 FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION

Defendant

SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC

Cross Defendants

INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT M&L, INC

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL D. MAY ATTORNEY AT LAW

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FILED BY SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC ON 03/14/2013

JUDGMENT FILED BY SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC ON 03/14/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES (101-201) FILED BY SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC; SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC ON 03/01/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES (101-201) FILED BY SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC; SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC ON 03/01/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC; SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC ON 03/01/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC; SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC ON 03/01/2013

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/05/2013 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/05/2013 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/13/2012 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/13/2012 02:00:00 PM.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 09/17/2012

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 09/17/2012

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 09/12/2012

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 09/12/2012

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/17/2012 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/17/2012 02:00:00 PM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 06/27/2012

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 06/27/2012

PAYMENT FOR 13 - MONEY SANCTIONS, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11125042 IN THE AMOUNT OF 300.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

PAYMENT FOR 13 - MONEY SANCTIONS, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11125042 IN THE AMOUNT OF 300.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 05/03/2012

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 05/03/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 13 - MONEY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF 300.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11125042 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10948934.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 13 - MONEY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF 300.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11125042 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10948934.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 03/23/2012

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 03/23/2012

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 03/23/2012

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 03/23/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 167 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 395.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11061546 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10885438.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 167 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 395.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11061546 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10885438.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/28/2012 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/28/2012 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 09/21/2011

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 09/21/2011

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 09/21/2011

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 09/21/2011

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC ON 03/14/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/18/2013 03:28:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC; SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC ON 03/01/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES (101-201) FILED BY SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC; SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC ON 03/01/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC; SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC ON 03/01/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2012
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY/TERMINATING SANCTIONS SCHEDULED FOR 03/20/2012 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 167 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 395.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11061546 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10885438.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC ON 01/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/28/2012 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 09/30/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 166 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 395.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10996107 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10819999.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHUMANN, TAM NOMOTO ON 09/21/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 09/21/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 09/21/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 09/21/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHEPPARD INVESTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY A NEBRASKA CORPORATION is a litigant