This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:05 (UTC).

FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. VS. BONNIE RISSE

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BONNIE RISSE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC.

Defendants

BONNIE RISSE

DAVID RISSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIX LAW, APLC

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 04/07/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 04/07/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/16/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927524 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751749.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927524 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751749.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/16/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 04/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4529932 RECEIVED ON 04/07/2016 12:47:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1310318 RECEIVED ON 03/16/2016 03:33:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927524 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751749.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1306930 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 11:01:21 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.