This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/10/2020 at 16:01:33 (UTC).

FEM VENTURES, LLC VS. LOS ANGELES KUSH, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2019 FEM VENTURES, LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against LOS ANGELES KUSH, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FEM Ventures, LLC

Eugenio Gonzalez

Defendants

Los Angeles Kush, Inc.

Los Angeles Kush, LLC

LAK Ventures, LLC

Scott Kawasaki

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEWMEYER & DILLION LLP

Defendant Attorneys

D R Welch Attorneys at Law

Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Other Attorneys

GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GONZALEZ, EUGENIO; FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 08/12/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GONZALEZ, EUGENIO; FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 08/12/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GONZALEZ, EUGENIO; FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 08/10/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GONZALEZ, EUGENIO; FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 08/10/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12736606 AND RECEIPT NUM

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12736606 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12562905.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY GONZALEZ, EUGENIO; FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 05/26/2020

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY GONZALEZ, EUGENIO; FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 05/26/2020

REQUEST - OTHER (NOTICE OF INABILITY TO DISMISS CASE; REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER) RECEIVED ON 05/26/2020.

REQUEST - OTHER (NOTICE OF INABILITY TO DISMISS CASE; REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER) RECEIVED ON 05/26/2020.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 02/05/2020

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 02/05/2020

NOTICE OF TRIAL (AND MSC) FILED BY GONZALEZ, EUGENIO; FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 11/27/2019

NOTICE OF TRIAL (AND MSC) FILED BY GONZALEZ, EUGENIO; FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 11/27/2019

OPPOSITION FILED BY GONZALEZ, EUGENIO; FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 11/27/2019

OPPOSITION FILED BY GONZALEZ, EUGENIO; FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 11/27/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/22/2019 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/22/2019 09:00:00 AM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2862070 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2862070 REJECTED.

OPPOSITION FILED BY FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 11/19/2019

OPPOSITION FILED BY FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 11/19/2019

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 11/12/2019

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 11/12/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GONZALEZ, EUGENIO; FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 11/08/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GONZALEZ, EUGENIO; FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 11/08/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LOS ANGELES KUSH, LLC ON 11/07/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LOS ANGELES KUSH, LLC ON 11/07/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LOS ANGELES KUSH, LLC ON 11/07/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LOS ANGELES KUSH, LLC ON 11/07/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 10/22/2019 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 10/22/2019 01:30:00 PM.

126 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GONZALEZ, EUGENIO; FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 08/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41105588 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2020 04:21:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1758668 RECEIVED ON 08/10/2020 05:17:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GONZALEZ, EUGENIO; FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 08/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12736606 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12562905.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3907001 RECEIVED ON 04/27/2020 04:55:59 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY GONZALEZ, EUGENIO; FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST - OTHER (NOTICE OF INABILITY TO DISMISS CASE; REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER) RECEIVED ON 05/26/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
171 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY GONZALEZ, EUGENIO; FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY GONZALEZ, EUGENIO; FEM VENTURES, LLC ON 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2808222 RECEIVED ON 06/21/2019 02:57:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO WALTER SCHWARM EFFECTIVE 06/13/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 04/22/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12538370 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12362170.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FEM VENTURES, LLC; GONZALEZ, EUGENIO ON 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FEM VENTURES, LLC; GONZALEZ, EUGENIO ON 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY FEM VENTURES, LLC; GONZALEZ, EUGENIO ON 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1614938 RECEIVED ON 04/22/2019 10:53:56 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less