This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/19/2018 at 04:50:48 (UTC).

FDK JENSEN, L.P. VS. HECTOR DIAZ

Case Summary

On 09/26/2016 FDK JENSEN, L P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HECTOR DIAZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FDK JENSEN, L.P.

Defendants

HECTOR DIAZ

SANDRA DIAZ

SAMMY DIAZ

JOSEFINA DIAZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN D. SILVERSTEIN

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 05/23/2017

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 05/23/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 04/07/2017 08:28:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 04/07/2017 08:28:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12081895 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11905863.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12081895 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11905863.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 12/23/16) RECEIVED ON 12/22/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 12/23/16) RECEIVED ON 12/22/2016.

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 11/14/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 11/14/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12050257 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11874202.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12050257 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11874202.

JUDGMENT FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 10/20/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 10/20/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 10/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 10/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 10/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 10/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 10/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 10/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 10/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 10/17/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 38 - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12045787 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11869725.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 38 - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12045787 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11869725.

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 10/14/2016

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 10/14/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/11/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/11/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/07/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/07/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DIAZ, SAMMY; DIAZ, JOSEFINA; DIAZ, SANDRA ON 10/07/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DIAZ, SAMMY; DIAZ, JOSEFINA; DIAZ, SANDRA ON 10/07/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12035477 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11859482.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12035477 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11859482.

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3548314 RECEIVED ON 05/23/2017 08:49:28 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 04/13/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 04/07/2017 08:28:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • THE CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/13/2017 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT N10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT SCHEDULED FOR 04/13/2017 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 04/06/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY DIAZ, SANDRA ON 03/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY DIAZ, JOSEFINA ON 10/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY DIAZ, SAMMY ON 10/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY DIAZ, HECTOR ON 10/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DIAZ, HECTOR ON 10/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12035477 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11859482.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 09/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 09/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY FDK JENSEN, L.P. ON 09/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3461531 RECEIVED ON 09/26/2016 02:23:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.