This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/24/2021 at 07:39:47 (UTC).

FARMERS INSURANCE VS. BRIANNE SMITH

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 FARMERS INSURANCE filed an Other lawsuit against BRIANNE SMITH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Farmers Insurance

Respondents

Brianne Smith

Delbert Carrillo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Murchison & Cumming, LLC

 

Court Documents

PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE ON 09/30/2021

PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE ON 09/30/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE ON 09/30/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE ON 09/30/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12951602 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12779507.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12951602 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12779507.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/05/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/05/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/05/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/05/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/05/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/05/2021

MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS (SET ONE) FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE ON 10/05/2021

MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS (SET ONE) FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE ON 10/05/2021

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE) FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE ON 10/05/2021

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE) FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE ON 10/05/2021

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE) FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE ON 10/05/2021

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE) FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE ON 10/05/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 180.00, TRANSACTION NUMBE

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 180.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12954310 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12782200.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES; Judge: SUPERVISING; Department: C12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION; Judge: SUPERVISING; Department: C12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; Judge: SUPERVISING; Department: C12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES SCHEDULED FOR 01/06/2022 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C12 AT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION SCHEDULED FOR 01/06/2022 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C12 AT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SCHEDULED FOR 01/06/2022 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C12 AT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 180.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12954310 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12782200.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1902431 RECEIVED ON 10/05/2021 03:24:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE) FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE ON 10/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE) FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE ON 10/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS (SET ONE) FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE ON 10/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12951602 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12779507.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41247047 RECEIVED ON 09/30/2021 03:15:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SUPERVISING ON 09/30/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE ON 09/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE ON 09/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant