This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 19:56:22 (UTC).

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE VS. THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Cross Defendants and Defendants

IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT

SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY, INC.

CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC

THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC

UNITED PAVING CO.

Other and Defendant

THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF HARTSUYKER, STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

KOELLER, NEBEKER, CARLSON & HALUCK, LLP

BULLARD, BROWN & BEAL, LLP

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A. HAUSER

Lincoln, Gustafson & Cercos, LLP

Defendant and Other Attorney

Lincoln, Gustafson & Cercos, LLP

Other Attorneys

KOELLER, NEBEKER, CARLSON & HALUCK, LL

LAW OFFICES OF HARTSUYKER, STRATMAN &

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 08/29/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 08/29/2018

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 05/01/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 05/01/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3786337 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3786337 REJECTED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT) FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 04/22/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT) FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 04/22/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/05/2019 08:06:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/05/2019 08:06:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12510348 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12334067.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12510348 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12334067.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 02/20/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 02/20/2019

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 02/20/2019

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 02/20/2019

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 03/01/2019

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 03/01/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 02/19/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 02/19/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/07/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/07/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY, INC. ON 12/13/2018

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY, INC. ON 12/13/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 12/17/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 12/17/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3734022 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3734022 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 12/04/2018

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 12/04/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12454483 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12278142.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12454483 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12278142.

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3786976 RECEIVED ON 05/01/2019 12:34:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3786337 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT) FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1615148 RECEIVED ON 04/22/2019 02:54:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 09/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1540659 RECEIVED ON 09/14/2018 11:05:05 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 09/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2711169 RECEIVED ON 09/11/2018 03:14:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12410977 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12234687.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3703854 RECEIVED ON 08/29/2018 03:31:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 08/29/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 08/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 08/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 08/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED PAVING CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA UNITED PAVING CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA WATER DISTRICT is a litigant