This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 20:01:09 (UTC).

FARID NIKKHOO VS. LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 FARID NIKKHOO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARID NIKKHOO

Defendant

LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • HearingDescription: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Department: C04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 07/15/2021 08:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL CONTINUED TO 08/25/2021 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/25/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL REASSIGNED TO VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 07/15/2021 AT 08:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/15/2021 AT 08:00:00 AM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21021739 RECEIVED ON 05/23/2021 11:14:16 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY NIKKHOO, FARID ON 05/24/2021; Filing Party: NIKKHOO, FARID ON 05/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/15/2021 AT 08:00:00 AM IN VCC4 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY EFFICIENTLEGALSUPPORT FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12883171 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12710910.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1843352 RECEIVED ON 05/04/2021 06:25:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY NIKKHOO, FARID ON 05/04/2021; Filing Party: NIKKHOO, FARID ON 05/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant