This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/12/2019 at 12:05:10 (UTC).

FARHAT RUDAT VS. YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF ORANGE COUNTY

Case Summary

On 08/27/2018 FARHAT RUDAT filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF ORANGE COUNTY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARHAT RUDAT

Defendants

YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF ORANGE COUNTY

YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF O

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR LABOR LAW, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

Carothers DiSante & Freudenberger LLP

Other Attorneys

SEYFARTH SHAW LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY RUDAT, FARHAT ON 08/27/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY RUDAT, FARHAT ON 08/27/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RUDAT, FARHAT ON 08/27/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RUDAT, FARHAT ON 08/27/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RUDAT, FARHAT ON 08/27/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RUDAT, FARHAT ON 08/27/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12408991 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12232699.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12408991 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12232699.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 08/27/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 08/27/2018.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/25/2019 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/25/2019 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RUDAT, FARHAT ON 10/01/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RUDAT, FARHAT ON 10/01/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/19/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/19/2018

STIPULATION AND ORDER (RE: ARBITRATION AND TO STAY ACTION) FILED BY YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 11/27/2018

STIPULATION AND ORDER (RE: ARBITRATION AND TO STAY ACTION) FILED BY YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 11/27/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12458480 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12282139.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12458480 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12282139.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 12/21/2018

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 12/21/2018

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY RUDAT, FARHAT ON 02/19/2019

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY RUDAT, FARHAT ON 02/19/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/02/2019 03:45:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/02/2019 03:45:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RUDAT, FARHAT ON 05/02/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RUDAT, FARHAT ON 05/02/2019

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RUDAT, FARHAT ON 05/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4965222 RECEIVED ON 05/02/2019 09:53:57 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/02/2019 03:45:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/13/2019 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C15.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 05/13/2019 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY RUDAT, FARHAT ON 02/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1592743 RECEIVED ON 02/19/2019 02:31:52 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/19/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RUDAT, FARHAT ON 10/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4892303 RECEIVED ON 10/01/2018 09:29:24 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/25/2019 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 08/27/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12408991 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12232699.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RUDAT, FARHAT ON 08/27/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RUDAT, FARHAT ON 08/27/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY RUDAT, FARHAT ON 08/27/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3702841 RECEIVED ON 08/27/2018 02:29:32 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF is a litigant