This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/13/2021 at 07:42:04 (UTC).

FARAH NAMIN VS. TARGET CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 FARAH NAMIN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against TARGET CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Farah Namin

Defendant

Target Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Cardoza Law Corporation

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY NAMIN, FARAH ON 11/19/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY NAMIN, FARAH ON 11/19/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NAMIN, FARAH ON 11/19/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NAMIN, FARAH ON 11/19/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12974413 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12802330.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12974413 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12802330.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/27/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/27/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31091479 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31091479 REJECTED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: CRANDALL; Department: C33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31091479 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/27/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12974413 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12802330.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31088617 RECEIVED ON 11/19/2021 01:04:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 11/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NAMIN, FARAH ON 11/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY NAMIN, FARAH ON 11/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant