This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/11/2019 at 11:38:16 (UTC).

FADI AKKAD VS. FULLERTON COLLEGE

Case Summary

On 05/29/2018 FADI AKKAD filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against FULLERTON COLLEGE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

FADI AKKAD

Respondent

FULLERTON COLLEGE

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AKKAD, FADI FOR 108 - APPEAL OF ADMINISTRATIVE FINE OR PENALTY IMPOSED BY LOCAL AGENCY IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12357802 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12181556.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AKKAD, FADI FOR 108 - APPEAL OF ADMINISTRATIVE FINE OR PENALTY IMPOSED BY LOCAL AGENCY IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12357802 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12181556.

NOTICE OF APPEAL (CIVIL CITATION) FILED BY AKKAD, FADI ON 05/29/2018

NOTICE OF APPEAL (CIVIL CITATION) FILED BY AKKAD, FADI ON 05/29/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AKKAD, FADI ON 05/29/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AKKAD, FADI ON 05/29/2018

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CIVIL CITATION AND REQUEST FOR FILE

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CIVIL CITATION AND REQUEST FOR FILE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CIVIL CITATION APPEAL 10/29/2018 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CIVIL CITATION APPEAL 10/29/2018 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CIVIL CITATION APPEAL 12/17/2018 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CIVIL CITATION APPEAL 12/17/2018 09:00:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEAL (1/14/2019) FILED

NOTICE OF APPEAL (1/14/2019) FILED

DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY AKKAD, FADI ON 01/22/2019

DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY AKKAD, FADI ON 01/22/2019

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY AKKAD, FADI ON 01/14/2019

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY AKKAD, FADI ON 01/14/2019

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AKKAD, FADI ON 03/06/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AKKAD, FADI ON 03/06/2019

MINUTE ORDER FROM APPELLATE DIVISION CASE NUMBER 30-2019-01049110

MINUTE ORDER FROM APPELLATE DIVISION CASE NUMBER 30-2019-01049110

REMITTITUR

REMITTITUR

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER FROM APPELLATE DIVISION CASE NUMBER 30-2019-01049110

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AKKAD, FADI ON 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY AKKAD, FADI ON 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • AKKAD, FADI REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 02/05/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY AKKAD, FADI ON 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY AKKAD, FADI ON 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL (1/14/2019) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2018
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL (CIVIL CITATION) HAS BEEN DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CIVIL CITATION APPEAL 10/29/2018 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • CIVIL CITATION APPEAL CONTINUED TO 12/17/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • CIVIL CITATION APPEAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/17/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • ADMINISTRATIVE DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON CIVIL CITATION AND REQUEST FOR FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • CIVIL CITATION APPEAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/29/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AKKAD, FADI FOR 108 - APPEAL OF ADMINISTRATIVE FINE OR PENALTY IMPOSED BY LOCAL AGENCY IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12357802 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12181556.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AKKAD, FADI ON 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL (CIVIL CITATION) FILED BY AKKAD, FADI ON 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FULLERTON COLLEGE is a litigant