This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:45:45 (UTC).

EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC VS. WM CHAPMAN, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against WM CHAPMAN, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Other

EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC

Debtor In Possession

JENNIFER K. DELCHAM

WM CHAPMAN, LLC

PARNELL DELCHAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorney

AIRES LAW FIRM

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12103385 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11927306.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12103385 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11927306.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 06/08/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 06/08/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/23/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/23/2017 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 03/01/16) RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 03/01/16) RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928299 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752517.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928299 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752517.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 07/22/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 07/22/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MOTION - OTHER FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 04/27/2016

MOTION - OTHER FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 04/27/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM), 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM), 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 205.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11959967 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11784111.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM), 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM), 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 205.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11959967 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11784111.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 06/02/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 06/02/2016

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 04/27/2016

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 04/27/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 02/26/2016

APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 02/26/2016

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 04/27/2016

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 04/27/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 06/02/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 06/02/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 06/20/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 06/20/2016

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 4/29/16) RECEIVED ON 04/27/2016.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 4/29/16) RECEIVED ON 04/27/2016.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 06/23/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 06/23/2016 09:00:00 AM.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/23/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 03/23/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12103385 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11927306.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 02/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3506860 RECEIVED ON 02/03/2017 09:48:21 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 03/23/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12101481 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11925400.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 01/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3505433 RECEIVED ON 01/31/2017 11:55:48 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 4/29/16) RECEIVED ON 04/27/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1319227 RECEIVED ON 04/27/2016 04:17:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SISTER STATE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SISTER STATE JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928299 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752517.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 03/01/16) RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY EXPRESS WORKING CAPITAL, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509944 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 06:25:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.