Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/19/2018 at 06:49:13 (UTC).

EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS. TAMARA LYNN HOEBEL

Case Summary

On 10/06/2016 EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TAMARA LYNN HOEBEL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

TAMARA LYNN HOEBEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN D. SILVERSTEIN

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 12/06/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 12/06/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12055992 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11879957.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12055992 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11879957.

WRIT (ISSUED 11/02/16 POSSESSION ONLY) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 11/02/16 POSSESSION ONLY) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/02/16) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/02/16) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/02/16) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/02/16) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/25/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/19/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/19/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/19/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/19/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/19/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/19/2016

AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST AMENDED) FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/11/2016

AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST AMENDED) FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/11/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (1ST AMENDED) FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/11/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (1ST AMENDED) FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/11/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12042239 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11866204.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12042239 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11866204.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/06/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/06/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/06/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/06/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/06/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/06/2016

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 12/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12055992 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11879957.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 11/02/16 POSSESSION ONLY) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/02/16) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/02/16) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3474175 RECEIVED ON 10/31/2016 10:15:25 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1350952 RECEIVED ON 10/25/2016 02:22:10 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1349817 RECEIVED ON 10/19/2016 10:53:56 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST AMENDED) FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (1ST AMENDED) FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3466887 RECEIVED ON 10/11/2016 09:20:08 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12042239 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11866204.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY EVERGREEN ROYALLE, A CA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1347685 RECEIVED ON 10/06/2016 04:25:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven D. Silverstein