This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:51:55 (UTC).

EUREKA REALTY PARTNERS, INC. VS. AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/21/2017 EUREKA REALTY PARTNERS, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CRAIG REALTY GROUP-MACARTHUR, LLC

EUREKA REALTY PARTNERS, INC.

CJK INVESTMENTS, LLC

EUREKA FOOD ENTERPRISES, LLC

Defendants and Cross Defendants

IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT

AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSUR

EUREKA REALTY PARTNERS, INC.

CJK INVESTMENTS, LLC

EUREKA FOOD ENTERPRISES, LLC

Defendants and Others

AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CRAIG REALTY GROUP

KOELLER, NEBEKER, CARLSON & HALUCK, LLP

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

KOELLER, NEBEKER, CARLSON & HALUCK, LLP

JONES TURNER, LLP

MORALES, FIERRO & REEVES

Defendant and Other Attorneys

JONES TURNER, LLP

MORALES, FIERRO & REEVES

Other Attorneys

KOELLER, NEBEKER, CARLSON & HALUCK, LL

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CJK INVESTMENTS, LLC; CRAIG REALTY GROUP-MACARTHUR, LLC; EUREKA FOOD ENTERPRISES, LLC; EUREKA REALTY PARTNERS, INC. ON 01/02/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CJK INVESTMENTS, LLC; CRAIG REALTY GROUP-MACARTHUR, LLC; EUREKA FOOD ENTERPRISES, LLC; EUREKA REALTY PARTNERS, INC. ON 01/02/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/29/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/29/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/08/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/08/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12211223 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12034918.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12211223 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12034918.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 08/28/2017

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 08/28/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/18/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/18/2017 09:00:00 AM.

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 08/22/2017

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 08/22/2017

NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY EUREKA REALTY PARTNERS, INC. ON 08/21/2017

NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY EUREKA REALTY PARTNERS, INC. ON 08/21/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 08/17/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 08/17/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 08/03/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 08/03/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 08/03/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 08/03/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 08/03/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT ON 08/03/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY EUREKA REALTY PARTNERS, INC. ON 08/02/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY EUREKA REALTY PARTNERS, INC. ON 08/02/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12197555 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12021290.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12197555 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12021290.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY EUREKA REALTY PARTNERS, INC.; EUREKA FOOD ENTERPRISES, LLC; CJK INVESTMENTS, LLC; CRAIG REALTY GROUP-MACARTHUR, LLC ON 08/02/2017

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY EUREKA REALTY PARTNERS, INC.; EUREKA FOOD ENTERPRISES, LLC; CJK INVESTMENTS, LLC; CRAIG REALTY GROUP-MACARTHUR, LLC ON 08/02/2017

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/14/2017

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/14/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12188266 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12011946.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12188266 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12011946.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT) FILED BY AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/14/2017

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT) FILED BY AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/14/2017

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CJK INVESTMENTS, LLC; CRAIG REALTY GROUP-MACARTHUR, LLC; EUREKA FOOD ENTERPRISES, LLC; EUREKA REALTY PARTNERS, INC. ON 01/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1454239 RECEIVED ON 01/02/2018 10:27:34 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/29/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3621182 RECEIVED ON 12/29/2017 09:46:44 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/08/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2590810 RECEIVED ON 09/08/2017 01:39:03 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12211223 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12034918.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY EUREKA REALTY PARTNERS, INC. ON 04/26/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4714615 RECEIVED ON 04/26/2017 08:15:04 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY EUREKA REALTY PARTNERS, INC. ON 04/26/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3538247 RECEIVED ON 04/26/2017 08:18:04 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 04/21/2017.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12143797 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11967580.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EUREKA REALTY PARTNERS, INC.; CRAIG REALTY GROUP-MACARTHUR, LLC; EUREKA FOOD ENTERPRISES, LLC; CJK INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 04/21/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EUREKA REALTY PARTNERS, INC.; CRAIG REALTY GROUP-MACARTHUR, LLC; EUREKA FOOD ENTERPRISES, LLC; CJK INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 04/21/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY EUREKA REALTY PARTNERS, INC.; CRAIG REALTY GROUP-MACARTHUR, LLC; EUREKA FOOD ENTERPRISES, LLC; CJK INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 04/21/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1380663 RECEIVED ON 04/21/2017 12:10:59 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRAIG REALTY GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where IRVINE RANCH WATER DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA WATER DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company is a litigant