This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 00:15:12 (UTC).

EUNICE LEE VS. GUY REGEV

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 EUNICE LEE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GUY REGEV. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EUNICE LEE

Defendant

GUY REGEV

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/23/2014 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2014 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/17/2014 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL REASSIGNED TO H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH ON 04/17/2014 AT 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • REQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY LEE, EUNICE ON 02/07/2014; Filing Party: LEE, EUNICE ON 02/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 02/25/2014 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H13 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY LEE, EUNICE ON 10/17/2013; Filing Party: LEE, EUNICE ON 10/17/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 5.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11476788 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11300700.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/17/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H13 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL REASSIGNED TO H13 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH ON 12/17/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11429850 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11253722.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/10/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY LEE, EUNICE ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: LEE, EUNICE ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less