This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/19/2022 at 00:50:06 (UTC).

EUN PARK VS HERMAN OH

Case Summary

On 06/01/2017 EUN PARK filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HERMAN OH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAFFNEY, DONALD F.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4607

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

GAFFNEY, DONALD F.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PARK, EUN JUNG

Respondent

OH, HERMAN S

 

Court Documents

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 06/01/2017 Amount:$435.00

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 06/01/2017 Amount:$435.00

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 06/01/2017

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 06/01/2017

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 06/01/2017

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 06/01/2017

ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 06/01/2017

ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 06/01/2017

SUMMONS 06/01/2017

SUMMONS 06/01/2017

RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 07/24/2017 Amount:$435.00

RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 07/24/2017 Amount:$435.00

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/24/2017

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/24/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 07/21/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 07/21/2017

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/02/2017

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/02/2017

RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 03/15/2018

RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 03/15/2018

RETURN SHEET - AT ISSUE 03/15/2018

RETURN SHEET - AT ISSUE 03/15/2018

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 02/22/2018 PRELIM AND FINAL

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 02/22/2018 PRELIM AND FINAL

MOTION - BIFURCATION 04/20/2018 Amount:$60.00

MOTION - BIFURCATION 04/20/2018 Amount:$60.00

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/20/2018

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/20/2018

MINUTE ORDER 05/25/2018

MINUTE ORDER 05/25/2018

RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 06/08/2018

RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 06/08/2018

STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 05/15/2018

STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 05/15/2018

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/15/2018 PRELIM & FINAL

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/15/2018 PRELIM & FINAL

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 07/26/2018; Filing Party: PARK, EUN JUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 07/26/2018; Filing Party: PARK, EUN JUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 07/26/2018; Filing Party: PARK, EUN JUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 06/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - MOTION - BIFURCATION; Department: L68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketHEARING - MOTION - BIFURCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER 05/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 05/15/2018; Filing Party: PARK, EUN JUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/15/2018 PRELIM & FINAL; Filing Party: PARK, EUN JUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - BIFURCATION 04/20/2018 Amount:$60.00; Filing Party: OH, HERMAN S

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/02/2017; Filing Party: PARK, EUN JUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 07/24/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: OH, HERMAN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/24/2017; Filing Party: OH, HERMAN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 07/21/2017; Filing Party: PARK, EUN JUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 06/01/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: PARK, EUN JUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE 06/01/2017; Filing Party: PARK, EUN JUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 06/01/2017; Filing Party: PARK, EUN JUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketREQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 06/01/2017; Filing Party: PARK, EUN JUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 06/01/2017; Filing Party: PARK, EUN JUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 06/01/2017; Filing Party: PARK, EUN JUNG

    Read MoreRead Less