This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 15:43:15 (UTC).

EUGENE MANIOUKOV VS. ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 EUGENE MANIOUKOV filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EUGENE MANIOUKOV

RACHEL RODRIGUEZ

Defendant

ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 01/03/2022 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketTHE COURT ORDERS EUGENE MANIOUKOV BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketTHE COURT TAKES THIS MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21105007 RECEIVED ON 12/30/2021 09:45:25 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC ON 12/30/2021; Filing Party: ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL CONTINUED TO 01/03/2022 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C4 PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/03/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL REASSIGNED TO C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 01/03/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 12/15/2021 08:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21099530 RECEIVED ON 12/13/2021 06:53:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY MANIOUKOV, EUGENE; RODRIGUEZ, RACHEL ON 12/13/2021; Filing Party: MANIOUKOV, EUGENE; RODRIGUEZ, RACHEL ON 12/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1927816 RECEIVED ON 12/10/2021 12:56:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC ON 12/10/2021; Filing Party: ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12962778 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12790701.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/15/2021 AT 08:00:00 AM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY MANIOUKOV, EUGENE; RODRIGUEZ, RACHEL ON 10/27/2021; Filing Party: MANIOUKOV, EUGENE; RODRIGUEZ, RACHEL ON 10/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Robinhood Financial LLC is a litigant