This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/20/2018 at 04:01:54 (UTC).

ESTATE OF CONCESA GARCIA NIQUE VS. ALTA MED

Case Summary

On 09/07/2016 ESTATE OF CONCESA GARCIA NIQUE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALTA MED. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LUIS GARCIA

HAYDE GARCIA

MARY GARCIA

ESTATE OF CONCESA GARCIA NIQUE

Defendants

ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER

CALIFORNIA HEART ASSOCIATES

WILL CHIN-WEI HUANG

ARVIND NIRULA

ROSAM HOSSEINIAN

TONY KHAN

DANIEL BETENCOURT

SEAN CAO

ALTA MED

MIHAELA SHABDEEN

TAMER M. FATHY

THUYAN NGUYEN

AMANDA DONAHUE

AMANDA DONOHUE

ALTAMED HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION

EMMANUEL FERRO

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF MARK H. APRAHAMIAN

Defendant Attorneys

SINCLITICO & BURNS

CARROLL, KELLY, TROTTER, FRANZEN, MCKENNA & PEABODY

CARROLL, KELLY, TROTTER, FRANZEN, MCBRIDE & PEABODY

REBACK, MCANDREWS, KJAR, WARFORD & STOCKALPER, LLP

KJAR, MCKENNA & STOCKALPER

Other Attorneys

FRASER, WATSON & CROUTCH, LLP

R.J. RYAN LAW, APC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NIRULA, ARVIND; CALIFORNIA HEART ASSOCIATES ON 09/19/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NIRULA, ARVIND; CALIFORNIA HEART ASSOCIATES ON 09/19/2018

ORDER - OTHER (RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/14/2018

ORDER - OTHER (RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/14/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 06/14/2018 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 06/14/2018 01:30:00 PM.

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 04/26/2018

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 04/26/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DONOHUE, AMANDA; CALIFORNIA HEART ASSOCIATES ON 04/02/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DONOHUE, AMANDA; CALIFORNIA HEART ASSOCIATES ON 04/02/2018

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY HOSSEINIAN, RASAM; NGUYEN, THUYVAN ON 03/29/2018

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY HOSSEINIAN, RASAM; NGUYEN, THUYVAN ON 03/29/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12308835 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12132575.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12308835 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12132575.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 02/01/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 02/01/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 02/01/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 02/01/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/01/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/01/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ESTATE OF CONCESA GARCIA NIQUE; GARCIA, HAYDE; GARCIA, LUIS; GARCIA, MARY ON 07/20/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ESTATE OF CONCESA GARCIA NIQUE; GARCIA, HAYDE; GARCIA, LUIS; GARCIA, MARY ON 07/20/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12184674 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12008374.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12184674 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12008374.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY BETHENCOURT, DANIEL ON 07/06/2017

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY BETHENCOURT, DANIEL ON 07/06/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DONOHUE, AMANDA; NIRULA, ARVIND; CALIFORNIA HEART ASSOCIATES ON 05/24/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DONOHUE, AMANDA; NIRULA, ARVIND; CALIFORNIA HEART ASSOCIATES ON 05/24/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DONOHUE, AMANDA; NIRULA, ARVIND; CALIFORNIA HEART ASSOCIATES ON 05/24/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DONOHUE, AMANDA; NIRULA, ARVIND; CALIFORNIA HEART ASSOCIATES ON 05/24/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/17/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/17/2017

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DONOHUE, AMANDA; NIRULA, ARVIND; CALIFORNIA HEART ASSOCIATES ON 04/20/2017

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DONOHUE, AMANDA; NIRULA, ARVIND; CALIFORNIA HEART ASSOCIATES ON 04/20/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 04/14/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 04/14/2017

149 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NIRULA, ARVIND; CALIFORNIA HEART ASSOCIATES ON 09/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY NIRULA, ARVIND; CALIFORNIA HEART ASSOCIATES ON 09/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1542416 RECEIVED ON 09/19/2018 05:07:25 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED.) FILED BY HOSSEINIAN, RASAM; NGUYEN, THUYVAN ON 08/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2655421 RECEIVED ON 03/29/2018 12:21:26 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY HOSSEINIAN, RASAM; NGUYEN, THUYVAN ON 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3683772 RECEIVED ON 07/02/2018 01:52:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY HOSSEINIAN, RASAM; NGUYEN, THUYVAN ON 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4858944 RECEIVED ON 06/22/2018 04:03:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
246 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/21/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ESTATE OF CONCESA GARCIA NIQUE; GARCIA, HAYDE; GARCIA, LUIS; GARCIA, MARY ON 03/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4686347 RECEIVED ON 03/02/2017 08:45:02 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/03/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 09/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12026247 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11850253.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ESTATE OF CONCESA GARCIA NIQUE; GARCIA, LUIS; GARCIA, HAYDE; GARCIA, MARY ON 09/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ESTATE OF CONCESA GARCIA NIQUE; GARCIA, LUIS; GARCIA, HAYDE; GARCIA, MARY ON 09/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ESTATE OF CONCESA GARCIA NIQUE; GARCIA, LUIS; GARCIA, HAYDE; GARCIA, MARY ON 09/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3454525 RECEIVED ON 09/07/2016 01:34:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less