This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/22/2019 at 05:22:29 (UTC).

ESCOTO V ESCOTO

Case Summary

On 08/20/2012 ESCOTO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ESCOTO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8047

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ESCOTO, MARIBEL DE LOS ANGELES

Respondent

ESCOTO, JOSE LUIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2012
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 12/05/2012 12:27:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: ESCOTO, MARIBEL DE LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 12/05/2012 12:25:00 # Pages:8; Filing Party: ESCOTO, MARIBEL DE LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • JUDGMENT 12/05/2012 12:24:00 # Pages:6; Filing Party: ESCOTO, MARIBEL DE LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • MINUTE ORDER 12/05/2012 08:30:00 # Pages:2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • JUDGMENT - DEFAULT 12/05/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • HRG - DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/15/2012 16:03:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: ESCOTO, MARIBEL DE LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 10/15/2012 12:44:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: ESCOTO, MARIBEL DE LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS 10/11/2012 14:54:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: ESCOTO, MARIBEL DE LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 10/11/2012 16:03:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: ESCOTO, MARIBEL DE LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 10/11/2012 16:03:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: ESCOTO, MARIBEL DE LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 10/11/2012 16:03:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: ESCOTO, MARIBEL DE LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 10/11/2012 16:53:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: ESCOTO, MARIBEL DE LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 08/20/2012 09:28:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: ESCOTO, MARIBEL DE LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 08/20/2012 13:14:00 FEE WAIVER GRANTED-DH # Pages:2; Filing Party: ESCOTO, MARIBEL DE LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/20/2012 16:08:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: ESCOTO, MARIBEL DE LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • SUMMONS 08/20/2012 16:08:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: ESCOTO, MARIBEL DE LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 08/20/2012 16:07:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: ESCOTO, MARIBEL DE LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less