This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:48:36 (UTC).

ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS. MENDOZA

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MENDOZA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

KENIA LIZBETH MENDOZA

GUSTAVO GAMEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4520804 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4520804 REJECTED.

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 04/07/2016

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 04/07/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 04/07/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 04/07/2016 08:30:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/03/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/03/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927082 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751307.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927082 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751307.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/07/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/07/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MENDOZA, KENIA LIZBETH ON 03/03/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MENDOZA, KENIA LIZBETH ON 03/03/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1310081 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1310081 REJECTED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 02/26/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 05/12/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 05/12/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 04/12/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 04/12/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 05/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11954768 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11778920.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 04/20/2016) RECEIVED ON 04/12/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 04/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 04/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1316109 RECEIVED ON 04/08/2016 03:49:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 04/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 04/07/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MENDOZA, KENIA LIZBETH ON 03/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • MENDOZA, KENIA LIZBETH REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 03/03/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MENDOZA, KENIA LIZBETH ON 03/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927082 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751307.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509477 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 10:29:30 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.