This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:18:49 (UTC).

ERNEST W. SCHROEDER VS. MIGUEL A. GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 ERNEST W SCHROEDER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MIGUEL A GOMEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ERNEST W. SCHROEDER

DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES

Defendant

MIGUEL A. GOMEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

WRIT (ISSUED ON 08/29/13) RECEIVED ON 08/27/2013.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 08/29/13) RECEIVED ON 08/27/2013.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W. ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W. ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W. ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W. ON 08/12/2013

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED ON 08/27/2013.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED ON 08/27/2013.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES; SCHROEDER, ERNEST W. ON 08/29/2013

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES; SCHROEDER, ERNEST W. ON 08/29/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 08/27/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 08/27/2013

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 12/02/2013

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 12/02/2013

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

COMPLAINT FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 08/12/2013

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 09/30/2013

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 09/30/2013

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/26/2013.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/26/2013.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 11/26/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 11/26/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 08/27/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 08/27/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11442918 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11266850.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11442918 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11266850.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES; SCHROEDER, ERNEST W. ON 08/29/2013

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES; SCHROEDER, ERNEST W. ON 08/29/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 11/26/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 11/26/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 11/26/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 11/26/2013

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2013
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 12/02/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/26/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 11/26/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 11/26/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 11/26/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4112584 RECEIVED ON 11/26/2013 11:21:29 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 09/30/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES; SCHROEDER, ERNEST W. ON 08/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES; SCHROEDER, ERNEST W. ON 08/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED ON 08/27/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/27/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 08/27/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 353901 RECEIVED ON 08/27/2013 03:27:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SCHROEDER, ERNEST W.; DONNA L. SCHROEDER, TRUSTEES ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1105588 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 03:22:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less