This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 00:14:28 (UTC).

ERNEST VARKEL VS. PAM MAPLE

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 ERNEST VARKEL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PAM MAPLE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERNEST VARKEL

Defendant

PAM MAPLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 10/10/2013 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • CORRESPONDENCE FILED BY MAPLE, PAM ON 10/02/2013; Filing Party: MAPLE, PAM ON 10/02/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY VARKEL, ERNEST ON 09/06/2013; Filing Party: VARKEL, ERNEST ON 09/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE SUBMITTED BY VARKEL, ERNEST REJECTED ON 08/19/2013.; Filing Party: SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE SUBMITTED BY VARKEL, ERNEST REJECTED ON 08/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430276 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254148.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION FILED BY VARKEL, ERNEST ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: VARKEL, ERNEST ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/10/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY VARKEL, ERNEST ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: VARKEL, ERNEST ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less