This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/24/2022 at 04:39:05 (UTC).

ERICKA ALEXANDRA MARAVILLA VS. THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 ERICKA ALEXANDRA MARAVILLA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ericka Alexandra Maravilla

Defendants

Aldo Lambruschini

The Irvine Company LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sherman Law Group

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/11/2023 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/11/2023 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13071394 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12899390.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13071394 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12899390.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARAVILLA, ERICKA ALEXANDRA ON 06/30/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARAVILLA, ERICKA ALEXANDRA ON 06/30/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY MARAVILLA, ERICKA ALEXANDRA ON 06/30/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY MARAVILLA, ERICKA ALEXANDRA ON 06/30/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARAVILLA, ERICKA ALEXANDRA ON 07/01/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARAVILLA, ERICKA ALEXANDRA ON 07/01/2022

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY MARAVILLA, ERICKA ALEXANDRA ON 07/13/2022

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY MARAVILLA, ERICKA ALEXANDRA ON 07/13/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GEORGE; Department: C24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31180401 RECEIVED ON 07/13/2022 01:26:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY MARAVILLA, ERICKA ALEXANDRA ON 07/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21178366 RECEIVED ON 07/01/2022 10:41:16 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11007416 RECEIVED ON 06/30/2022 03:00:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13071394 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12899390.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/11/2023 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARAVILLA, ERICKA ALEXANDRA ON 07/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MARAVILLA, ERICKA ALEXANDRA ON 06/30/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARAVILLA, ERICKA ALEXANDRA ON 06/30/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GEORGE, STEPHANIE ON 06/30/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Irvine Company, LLC is a litigant