This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/23/2022 at 03:41:10 (UTC).

ERICK FIELDS VS. AMAZON RETAIL LLC

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 ERICK FIELDS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AMAZON RETAIL LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Erick Fields

Defendant

Amazon Retail LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradley/Grombacher LLP

Defendant Attorney

Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY FIELDS, ERICK ON 02/08/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY FIELDS, ERICK ON 02/08/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FIELDS, ERICK ON 02/08/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FIELDS, ERICK ON 02/08/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FIELDS, ERICK ON 02/08/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FIELDS, ERICK ON 02/08/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13005841 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12833793.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13005841 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12833793.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FIELDS, ERICK ON 02/15/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FIELDS, ERICK ON 02/15/2022

CLASS ACTION / B 17200 QUESTIONNAIRE FILED BY FIELDS, ERICK ON 03/03/2022

CLASS ACTION / B 17200 QUESTIONNAIRE FILED BY FIELDS, ERICK ON 03/03/2022

CASE REASSIGNED TO WILLIAM CLASTER EFFECTIVE 04/15/2022.

CASE REASSIGNED TO WILLIAM CLASTER EFFECTIVE 04/15/2022.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13019649 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12847596.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13019649 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12847596.

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY AMAZON RETAIL LLC ON 03/10/2022

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY AMAZON RETAIL LLC ON 03/10/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO WILLIAM CLASTER EFFECTIVE 04/15/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31130255 RECEIVED ON 03/10/2022 05:17:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13019649 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12847596.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY AMAZON RETAIL LLC ON 03/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21129561 RECEIVED ON 03/03/2022 11:48:33 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLASS ACTION / B 17200 QUESTIONNAIRE FILED BY FIELDS, ERICK ON 03/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21123110 RECEIVED ON 02/15/2022 02:17:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FIELDS, ERICK ON 02/15/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41295958 RECEIVED ON 02/08/2022 05:03:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13005841 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12833793.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY FIELDS, ERICK ON 02/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FIELDS, ERICK ON 02/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FIELDS, ERICK ON 02/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DI CESARE, JAMES ON 02/08/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon Retail, LLC is a litigant