This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:46:24 (UTC).

ERIC STONE VS. LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ERIC STONE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERIC STONE

Defendants

GEORGE GUZMAN

LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRETT SZMANDA

SZMANDA LAW GROUP, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

CORTEZ TRENEER & ASSOCIATES

LAW OFFICES WADE & LOW

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 06/22/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 06/22/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GUZMAN, GEORGE ON 10/18/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GUZMAN, GEORGE ON 10/18/2016

NOTICE OF HEARING (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 08/01/2016

NOTICE OF HEARING (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 08/01/2016

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 10/12/2016

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 10/12/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 02/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/11/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/11/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/21/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/21/2016 09:00:00 AM.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY GUZMAN, GEORGE ON 10/18/2016

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY GUZMAN, GEORGE ON 10/18/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 10/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 10/17/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 05/05/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 05/05/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/12/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/12/2016 09:00:00 AM.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 07/18/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 07/18/2016

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 03/13/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 03/13/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/11/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/11/2016 08:30:00 AM.

NOTICE OF HEARING (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 06/22/2016

NOTICE OF HEARING (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 06/22/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 06/22/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 06/22/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 08/09/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 08/09/2016

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 05/06/2016

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 05/06/2016

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 03/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4691682 RECEIVED ON 03/13/2017 10:41:53 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 02/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4685031 RECEIVED ON 02/28/2017 11:07:12 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 02/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 02/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3515949 RECEIVED ON 02/28/2017 11:31:09 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4670752 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 04/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2457916 RECEIVED ON 04/26/2016 11:04:58 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/11/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 02/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4510415 RECEIVED ON 02/29/2016 01:51:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927821 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752046.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY STONE, ERIC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509718 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 02:22:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.