This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/08/2020 at 07:00:09 (UTC).

ERIC H WINSTON VS. AMPCO CONTRACTING, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 ERIC H WINSTON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMPCO CONTRACTING, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric H Winston

Defendants

AMPCO North, Inc.

AMPCO Contracting, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Feldhake Law Firm, APC

Defendant Attorney

Manahan, Flashman & Brandon

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12782402 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12609152.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12782402 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12609152.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY AMPCO CONTRACTING, INC.; AMPCO NORTH, INC. ON 09/16/2020

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY AMPCO CONTRACTING, INC.; AMPCO NORTH, INC. ON 09/16/2020

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 09/14/2020

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 09/14/2020

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/14/2020

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/14/2020

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 08/18/2020

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 08/18/2020

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 08/18/2020

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 08/18/2020

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 08/18/2020

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 08/18/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 08/18/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 08/18/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 08/18/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 08/18/2020

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/20/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/20/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/18/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/18/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDERS FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 07/22/2020

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDERS FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 07/22/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12755642 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12581981.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12755642 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12581981.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDERS RECEIVED ON 07/20/2020.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDERS RECEIVED ON 07/20/2020.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 05/26/2020.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 05/26/2020.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12737489 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12563788.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12737489 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12563788.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 05/26/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 05/26/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 05/26/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 05/26/2020

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: LEWIS; Department: C26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: LEWIS; Department: C26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12782402 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12609152.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3936146 RECEIVED ON 09/14/2020 09:31:01 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY AMPCO CONTRACTING, INC.; AMPCO NORTH, INC. ON 09/16/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 09/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41114029 RECEIVED ON 09/14/2020 09:30:26 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 08/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 08/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDERS FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 07/22/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12755642 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12581981.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3921262 RECEIVED ON 07/20/2020 04:34:35 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDERS RECEIVED ON 07/20/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12737489 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12563788.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3903960 RECEIVED ON 04/06/2020 10:40:40 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 05/26/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 05/26/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 05/26/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY WINSTON, ERIC H ON 05/26/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMPCO NORTH is a litigant

Latest cases where AMPCO CONTRACTING INC. is a litigant