This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/05/2021 at 06:49:34 (UTC).

EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC VS. SUMMER PARTAIN

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SUMMER PARTAIN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equity Residential Management, LLC

Defendant

Summer Partain

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gurstel Law Firm, P.C.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 08/05/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 08/05/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 07/14/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 07/14/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1866768 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1866768 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12903889 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12731702.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12903889 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12731702.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 06/23/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 06/23/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 06/23/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 06/23/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 08/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31047196 RECEIVED ON 08/05/2021 01:22:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 07/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41216332 RECEIVED ON 07/14/2021 08:27:31 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1866768 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12903889 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12731702.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 06/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 06/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21033529 RECEIVED ON 06/23/2021 10:46:05 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equity Residential Management LLC is a litigant