This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 04:40:08 (UTC).

EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC VS. JENNIFER ROSE

Case Summary

On 11/22/2016 EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JENNIFER ROSE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC

Defendant

JENNIFER ROSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 03/09/2017

JUDGMENT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 03/09/2017

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 02/27/2017.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 02/27/2017.

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 02/27/2017

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 02/27/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 02/27/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 02/27/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 01/09/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 01/09/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 12/22/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 12/22/2016

WRIT (ISSUED ON 12/23/16) RECEIVED ON 12/22/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 12/23/16) RECEIVED ON 12/22/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 12/23/16) RECEIVED ON 12/22/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 12/23/16) RECEIVED ON 12/22/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 12/23/16) RECEIVED ON 12/22/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 12/23/16) RECEIVED ON 12/22/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 12/22/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 12/22/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/13/2017 AT 01:30:00 PM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/13/2017 AT 01:30:00 PM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12068644 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11892589.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12068644 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11892589.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 11/29/2016.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 11/29/2016.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12066571 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11890538.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12066571 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11890538.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 11/22/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 11/22/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 11/22/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 11/22/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 11/22/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 11/22/2016

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 03/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 02/27/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 02/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 02/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 02/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2533755 RECEIVED ON 02/27/2017 09:49:06 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 01/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 12/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12068644 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11892589.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 11/29/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2512299 RECEIVED ON 11/29/2016 08:24:49 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12066571 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11890538.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 11/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 11/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 11/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3482503 RECEIVED ON 11/22/2016 01:16:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equity Residential Management LLC is a litigant