Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 04:03:05 (UTC).

EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. VS. CESAR GAMARRA

Case Summary

On 11/18/2016 EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CESAR GAMARRA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC.

Defendants

CESAR GAMARRA

DAVID GAMARRA

TERESA CARNERO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12154697 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11978417.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12154697 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11978417.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 05/10/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 05/10/2017

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 05/10/2017

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 05/10/2017

WRIT (ISSUED ON 05/12/2017) RECEIVED ON 05/10/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 05/12/2017) RECEIVED ON 05/10/2017.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 01/18/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 01/18/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 12/22/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 12/22/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (PURSUANT TO STIPULATION) FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 12/21/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (PURSUANT TO STIPULATION) FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 12/21/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 12/21/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 12/21/2016 09:00:00 AM.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/21/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/21/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 12/02/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 12/02/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 12/02/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 12/02/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 12/02/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 12/02/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 12/02/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 12/02/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/01/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/01/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/01/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/01/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GAMARRA, CESAR; CARNERO, TERESA; GAMARRA, DAVID ON 12/01/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GAMARRA, CESAR; CARNERO, TERESA; GAMARRA, DAVID ON 12/01/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12065197 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11889155.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12065197 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11889155.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12154697 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11978417.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 05/12/2017) RECEIVED ON 05/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3543625 RECEIVED ON 05/10/2017 11:02:22 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 01/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12082119 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11906087.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 12/23/2016) RECEIVED ON 12/22/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 12/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • GAMARRA, DAVID REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 12/01/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY GAMARRA, DAVID ON 12/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GAMARRA, CESAR; CARNERO, TERESA; GAMARRA, DAVID ON 12/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12065197 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11889155.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 11/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 11/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY EQR-DEL LAGO VISTAS, INC. ON 11/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3481369 RECEIVED ON 11/18/2016 02:07:29 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EQR-Del Lago Vistas, Inc. is a litigant